EP0208933 - Supported catalyst, method for its preparation and its use in the production of hydroxide phenyl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Immel, Otto, Dr. Immenhofweg 26 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Weissel, Oskar, Dr. Deswatinesstrasse 70 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Schwarz, Hans-Helmut, Dr. Ratherstrasse 90 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1987/04] | Application number, filing date | 86108228.7 | 16.06.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | DE19853523205 | 28.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3523205 | [1987/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208933 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208933 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/64, B01J27/02, C07C37/07, // C07C37/06 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
C07C37/07 (EP,US);
B01J23/6562 (EP,US);
B01J27/02 (EP,US);
C07C37/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/06, C07C39/15 (US,EP);
C07C37/07, C07C39/15 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/04] | Title | German: | Trägerkatalysator, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung sowie dessen Verwendung zur Herstellung von Hydroxydiphenyl | [1987/04] | English: | Supported catalyst, method for its preparation and its use in the production of hydroxide phenyl | [1987/04] | French: | Catalyseur sur support, procédé pour sa préparation et son utilisation pour la préparation d'hydroxydiphényle | [1987/04] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 05.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0001425 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0018763 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]); | [A]US4288347 (RABINOVICH GEORGY L, et al); | [A]FR2177951 (DEGUSSA [DE]) |