EP0206266 - Radical-ion salts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huenig, Siegfried, Dr. Mittlerer Neubergweg 16 D-8700 Wuerzburg / DE | 02 /
Aumueller, Alexander, Dr. Brechlochstrasse 9 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Erk, Peter Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 14 D-8708 Gerbrunn / DE | [1986/52] | Application number, filing date | 86108389.7 | 19.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | DE19853522232 | 21.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3522232 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206266 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206266 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0206266 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C125/08, C08K5/16, H01M4/60, H01M4/10, H01L31/02 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
H01M6/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/315 (EP,US);
H01M4/60 (EP,US);
H01M4/9008 (EP,US);
H01M6/166 (EP,US);
H10K85/611 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Radikalionensalze | [1986/52] | English: | Radical-ion salts | [1986/52] | French: | Sels d'ions radicalaires | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 09.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3437814 (BASF AG [DE]) |