EP0207390 - Process for the recovery of amine and metal compounds in the preparation of polyphenylene ether [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitulla, Konrad, Dr. Schwalbenweg 31 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Hambrecht, Juergen, Dr. Am Klosterwald 31 D-4400 Muenster-Hiltrup / DE | 03 /
Marquardt, Siegfried Georg-Biundo-Strasse 9 D-6712 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 04 /
Brandt, Hermann, Dr. Keltenstrasse 30 D-6707 Schifferstadt / DE | 05 /
Schmitt, Burghard, Dr. Braeunigstrasse 12 D-6520 Worms 24 / DE | 06 /
Gausepohl, Hermann, Dr. Neuweg 10 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | 07 /
Siebel, Peter, Dr. Trifelsring 20 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 08 /
Dreher, Hermann, Dr. Im Waldwinkel 5 D-6104 Seeheim-Jugenheim 1 / DE | [1987/02] | Application number, filing date | 86108397.0 | 19.06.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | DE19853522470 | 22.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3522470 | [1987/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207390 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207390 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/46, C02F9/00 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
C08G65/46 (EP);
C02F1/683 (EP);
C02F2101/20 (EP);
C02F2101/345 (EP);
C02F2103/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung der Amin- und Metallkomponenten beider Polyphenylenethersynthese | [1987/02] | English: | Process for the recovery of amine and metal compounds in the preparation of polyphenylene ether | [1987/02] | French: | Procédé de récupération de composés métalliques et aminiques dans la préparation de poly(oxyphénylène) | [1987/02] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/02] | 29.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4071500 (COOPER GLENN DALE, et al); | [X]US3733301 (MODAN M) |