EP0207396 - Tetrahydrofurancarboxylic-acid derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1990 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helwig, Reinhard, Dr. Brüsseler Ring 4 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Neumann, Peter, Dr. Franz-Schubert-Strasse 1 D-6908 Wiesloch / DE | 03 /
Aumüller, Alexander, Dr. Brechlochstrasse 9 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Trauth, Hubert Milanstrasse 6 D-6724 Dudenhofen / DE | [1987/02] | Application number, filing date | 86108428.3 | 20.06.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | DE19853522678 | 25.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3522678 | [1987/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207396 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207396 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C08K5/15, C08K5/34, C09D7/12 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D307/24 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C09D7/48 (EP,US);
C08K5/1535 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/02] | C07D307/56, C08K5/15, C09D7/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/02] | Title | German: | Tetrahydrofurancarbonsäurederivate | [1987/02] | English: | Tetrahydrofurancarboxylic-acid derivatives | [1987/02] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide tétrahydrofuranecarboxylique | [1987/02] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 03.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2735051 [ ] (DELMAR CHEM); | DE3117389 [ ] (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | EP0103115 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 88, Nr. 2, 9. Janner 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA IVANOV, A,A,; PRIMELLES A, EDUARDO; GIL F., ALEXIS "Synthesis and some characteristics of 2,5-furandicarboxylic acid polymers" Seite 3, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 7 444y & SOBRE DERIV. CANA AZUCAR 1976, 10(2), 27-52 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, Nr. 14, 2. Oktober 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA MOORE, J. A.; KELLY, J. E. "Polyesters derived from furan and tetrahydrofuran nuclei" Seite 6, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 110 483e & MACROMOLECULES 1978, 11(3), 568-73 | Examination | DE1929928 | DE2040975 | DE2258752 | DE2349962 | DE2623422 | DE3345376 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 88, no. 2, 9. Januar 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA, A.A. IVANOV; A.E. PRIMELLES; F.A. GIL "Synthesis and some characteristics of 2,5-furandicarboxylic acid polymers", p. 3, Zusammenfassung no. 7 444y | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, no. 14, 2. Oktober 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA, J.A. MOORE; J.E. KELLY "Polyesters derived from furan and tetrahydrofuran nuclei", p. 6, Zusammenfassung no. 110 483e |