EP0206294 - Alkyl esters of 3-hydroxy-3-(2-methyl-5-pyridyl)-propionic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1991 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza AG Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states LONZA AG CH-3945 Gampel/Wallis / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grayson, James Ian, Dr. 60 Albert Street Western Hill Durham DH1 4RJ / GB | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86108476.2 | 20.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | CH19850002614 | 20.06.1985 Original published format: CH 261485 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0206294 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0206294 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/55 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
C07D213/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | 3-Hydroxy-3-(2-Methyl-5-pyridyl)-propionsäurealkylester | [1986/52] | English: | Alkyl esters of 3-hydroxy-3-(2-methyl-5-pyridyl)-propionic acid | [1986/52] | French: | Esters alcoyliques de l'acide 3-hydroxy-3-(2-méthyl-5-pyridyl)-propionique | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0003677 [ ] (SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]); | EP0070185 [ ] (SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORP [US]) | Examination | - Chem. Abstr. vol. 40, no. 16, 1946, Spalte 4723-4725 |