EP0206312 - Toilet bowl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1988 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menge, Heinrich Eissendorfer Pferdeweg 45 D-21075 Hamburg / DE | [1986/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Heldt, Gert, et al Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwalt Holstenwall 10 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Neuer Wall 59 III D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86108584.3 | 24.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | DE19853522642 | 25.06.1985 Original published format: DE 3522642 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206312 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206312 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/052 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
E03D9/052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | Toilettenbecken | [1986/52] | English: | Toilet bowl | [1986/52] | French: | Cuvette de toilette | [1986/52] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/30] | 03.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1424955 ; | [X]FR2067610 ; | [Y]US1931052 ; | [A]FR571876 ; | [A]FR2385852 |