EP0206330 - Method for controlling screen display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/52] | Apparatus for controlling screen display | ||
[1992/20] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakata, Yoshiaki Hitachi Shumeiryo 248-1, Mimomichohongo Narashino-shi / JP | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/52] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86108655.1 | 25.06.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | JP19850137728 | 26.06.1985 Original published format: JP 13772885 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206330 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206330 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/00 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
G09G5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/52] | Title | German: | Bildschirmanzeigesteuermethode | [1992/20] | English: | Method for controlling screen display | [1992/20] | French: | Méthode de commande d'affichage d'écran | [1992/20] |
Former [1986/52] | Bildschirmanzeigesteuergerät | ||
Former [1986/52] | Apparatus for controlling screen display | ||
Former [1986/52] | Appareil de commande d'affichage d'écran | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2314542 (ANVAR [FR]); | [Y]US4245244 (LIJEWSKI ROBERT R, et al); | [Y]WO8401655 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [Y]FR2535497 (CADTRAK CORP [US]); | [A]EP0121015 (IBM [US]) | [Y] - COMPUTER DESIGN, vol. 20, no. 8, 13th August 1981, pages 135-137, Winchester, Mass., US; H.H. NG et al.: "Touch-sensitive screens ensure a user friendly interface" |