EP0208963 - Silicon pastes having a reduced curing time [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Würminghausen, Thomas, Dr. Christian-Hess-Strasse 65 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Sattlegger, Hans, Dr. Auf dem Heidchen 9 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1987/04] | Application number, filing date | 86108698.1 | 26.06.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | DE19853524452 | 09.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3524452 | [1987/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0208963 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0208963 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208963 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US);
C08G77/70 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/09, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/44 (US,EP);
C08L83/04, C08L83/04, C08K5/09, C08K5/54, C08K5/54, C08K5/54 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/04] | Title | German: | RTV-Siliconpasten mit verkürzter Aushärtungszeit | [1987/04] | English: | Silicon pastes having a reduced curing time | [1987/04] | French: | Pâtes de silicones ayant un temps de durcissement réduit | [1991/30] |
Former [1987/04] | Pâtes de silicones ayant un temps de durcissement raccourci | Examination procedure | 26.06.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2026512 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [X]GB2059979 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]EP0050453 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]); | [A]DE3143705 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0138103 (BAYER AG [DE]) |