EP0207469 - Flaky zirconia type fine crystals and method for producing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Etsuro No. 956, Aza Waseda Oaza Kumabari Nagakute-cho Aichi-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86108797.1 | 27.06.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | JP19850147238 | 03.07.1985 Original published format: JP 14723885 | JP19850278526 | 10.12.1985 Original published format: JP 27852685 | JP19850278527 | 10.12.1985 Original published format: JP 27852785 | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207469 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207469 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C01G25/00 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01G25/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10G25/003 (EP,US);
C03C3/06 (KR);
C01P2002/22 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/02] | Title | German: | Schuppenartige feine Kristalle des Zirkoniumoxydtyps und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1987/02] | English: | Flaky zirconia type fine crystals and method for producing them | [1987/02] | French: | Cristaux fins écailleux du type zircone et leur procédé d'obtention | [1993/13] |
Former [1987/02] | Cristaux fins écailleux du type zircone et son procédé d'obtention | Examination procedure | 23.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/35] | 29.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 25.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.03.1993 | SE | 31.03.1993 | [1993/51] |
Former [1993/46] | SE | 31.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2035587 (POLAROID CORP) | [A] - AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 20, March 1967, pages 415-428; I.J. BEAR: "Factors influencing the mode of thermal decomposition of zirconium sulphate tetrahydrate" | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 74, April-June 1952, pages 2104,2105, Mack Printing Co.; W.S. CLABAUGH et al.: "Method for freeing zirconium of common impurities and for preparing zirconium sulfate and oxide" |