|
09.04.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.1998 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.02.1998 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.1998 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.10.1997 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.10.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1994 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.03.1994 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.04.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1990 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1989 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.1986 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
02.07.1980 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |