EP0208990 - Movement detection circuit for television signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Achiha, Masahiko 19-16, Azumacho-7-chome Iruma-shi / JP | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/04] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86108994.4 | 02.07.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | JP19850152206 | 12.07.1985 Original published format: JP 15220685 | [1987/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0208990 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0208990 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
H04N9/646 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, NL [1987/04] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Feststellung von Bewegung für Fernsehsignale | [1987/04] | English: | Movement detection circuit for television signals | [1987/04] | French: | Circuit de détection de mouvement pour des signaux de télévision | [1987/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.07.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/20] | 14.12.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.12.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4223341 (DREWERY JOHN O); | [Y]EP0104828 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]); | [A]EP0132832 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - N.E.C. RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, no. 77, April 1985, pages 38-43, Tokyo, JP; N. SUZUKI et al.: "NTSC TV scan conversion using motion adaptive processings" |