EP0209017 - Transporting device for garments hanging on hangers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Götz, Peter Dorfstrasse 81 D-7470 Albstadt 14-Margrethausen / DE | [1987/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götz, Peter Dorfstrasse 81 D-7470 Albstadt 14-Margrethausen / DE | 02 /
Götz, Franz Dorfstrasse 81 D-7470 Albstadt 14-Margrethausen / DE | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Rudolf Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Möbus, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Hindenburgstrasse 65 D-72762 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109156.9 | 04.07.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | DE19853524221 | 06.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3524221 | [1987/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0209017 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209017 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65G49/00, D06F95/00 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
D06F73/02 (EP);
B65G47/61 (EP);
B65G2201/0229 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/04] | Title | German: | Transporteinrichtung für auf Kleiderbügeln hängende Kleidungsstücke | [1987/04] | English: | Transporting device for garments hanging on hangers | [1987/04] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour vêtements suspendus sur des cintres | [1988/35] |
Former [1987/04] | Dispositif de transport pour vêtement étant suspendus à des cintres | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 17.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.08.1988 | GB | 31.08.1988 | IT | 31.08.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/03] | GB | 31.08.1988 | |
IT | 31.08.1988 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 31.08.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1118700 ; | [A]GB2079708 ; | [A]DE2836750 ; | [A]DE7041979U ; | [A]DE7715547U ; | [A]BE835127R ; | [A]DD116439 |