EP0209088 - Laundry washing and drying machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zanussi Elettrodomestici S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3, C.P. 147 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1987/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Del Frate, Franco Via Monte Pelmo 12 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/04] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86109496.9 | 11.07.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | IT19850045726 | 15.07.1985 Original published format: IT 4572685 | [1987/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0209088 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D06F29/00 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
D06F29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/04] | Title | German: | Wasch- und Trockenmaschine | [1987/04] | English: | Laundry washing and drying machine | [1987/04] | French: | Machine à laver et à sécher le linge | [1987/04] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/11] | 19.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]LU29017 ; | [A]US1714276 (OBERWEGNER ALFRED R); | [A]FR763967 ; | [A]GB582804 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD); | [A]US2871688 (EDUARD GELDHOF PETER) |