EP0210530 - 6-Arylalkenyl pyridazinones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonas, Rochus, Dr. Kesselhutweg 12 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Piulats, Jaime, Dr. Rvdo. Quintin Mallofre 2 ES-08030-Barcelona / ES | 03 /
Lues, Ingeborg, Dr. Paul Wagnerstrasse 13 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Schliep, Hans-Jochen, Dr. Weingartenstrasse 16 D-6109 Traisa / DE | [1987/06] | Application number, filing date | 86109671.7 | 15.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | DE19853527036 | 27.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3527036 | DE19863617383 | 23.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3617383 | [1987/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210530 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/04, A61K31/50 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
C07D237/14 (EP);
C07D237/04 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | 6-Arylalkenylpyridazinone | [1987/06] | English: | 6-Arylalkenyl pyridazinones | [1987/06] | French: | 6-Arylalcénylpyridazinones | [1987/06] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 10.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0010156 [ ] (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | GB2122195 [ ] (THEA THERAPEUTIQUE & APPLICAT) |