EP0216048 - Regulation method for a direct current high-voltage power transmission between two three-phase networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schraudolph, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Marienbader Strasse 50 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Storner, Christa Lindenweg 22 D-8521 Grossenseebach / DE | [1987/14] | Application number, filing date | 86109776.4 | 16.07.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | DE19853530422 | 26.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3530422 | [1987/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216048 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216048 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0216048 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/36 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/14] | Title | German: | Regelverfahren für eine zwei Drehstromnetze verbindende Hochspannungsgleichstromübertragung | [1987/14] | English: | Regulation method for a direct current high-voltage power transmission between two three-phase networks | [1987/14] | French: | Procédé de régulation pour la transmission haute tension à courant continu entre deux réseaux triphasés | [1987/14] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.11.1992 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2901263 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]US4264951 (KONISHI HIROO, et al); | [A]US4330815 (KONISHI HIROO); | [A]EP0067978 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - REVUE GENERALE DE L'ELECTRICITE vol. 42, no. 4, April 1958, PARIS FR Seite 203 - 209; S. BOICHIDZE: "Sur le réglage automatique d'une liaison à courant continu entre réseaux à courant alternatif" |