EP0209876 - Universal bending machine and respective method for bending [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1988 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLM S.p.A. Via Selvaregina, 30 Cantu / IT | [1988/15] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states Ballico, Giuliano Via 4 Settembre I-33040 Povoletto (UD) / IT | ||
For all designated states Hütter, Gerald Via Cavour 29 I-33050 Mortegliano (UD) / IT | |||
For all designated states Tosolini, Giorgio Via P. Micca 30 I-33040 Povoletto (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballico, Giuliano Via 4 Settembre I-33040 Povoletto (UD) / IT | 02 /
Hütter, Gerald Via Cavour 29 I-33050 Mortegliano (UD) / IT | 03 /
Tosolini, Giorgio Via P. Micca 30 I-Povoletto (UD) / IT | [1988/17] |
Former [1987/05] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Mayer, Hans Benno de Dominicis & Mayer Piazzale Marengo 6 I-20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Mayer, Hans Benno de Dominicis & Mayer Piazzale Marengo 6 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1987/05] | D'Agostini, Giovanni, Dr. D'AGOSTINI ORGANIZZAZIONE Via G. Giusti 17 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 86109981.0 | 21.07.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | IT19850083383 | 22.07.1985 Original published format: IT 8338385 | [1987/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0209876 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0209876 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/022, B21D7/12 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
B21D7/022 (EP);
B21D7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1987/05] | Title | German: | Universalbiegemaschine und entsprechendes Biegeverfahren | [1987/05] | English: | Universal bending machine and respective method for bending | [1987/05] | French: | Machine à cintrer universelle et procédé de cintrage correspondant | [1987/05] | File destroyed: | 19.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3373587 (NIKOLAEVICH SHUBIN VLADIMIR, et al); | [Y]US3493016 (OTT ERNST G); | [A]US4052878 (CONNELLY DENNIS E); | [Y]US4161110 (JAHRBACHER GERT [AT], et al) |