EP0209883 - Hydraulically damped engine mount having two chambers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.04.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.1995 | Opposition rejected | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METZELER GIMETALL AG Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-80992 München / DE | [1991/26] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states METZELER Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-80992 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states METZELER KAUTSCHUK GMBH Gneisenaustrasse 15 D-8000 München 50 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrä, Rainer, Dr. Dehrner Strasse 10 D-6250 Limburg 5 / DE | 02 /
Hofmann, Manfred Gerhard von Dietz-Strasse 15 D-6257 Hünfelden / DE | [1987/05] | Representative(s) | Michelis, Theodor, et al Seibert + Michelis Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing., et al Seibert + Michelis Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/05] | Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110017.0 | 21.07.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | DE19853526686 | 25.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3526686 | [1987/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0209883 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0209883 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209883 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00, B60K5/12 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
F16F13/106 (EP,US);
F16F13/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/05] | Title | German: | Zweikammer-Motorlager mit hydraulischer Dämpfung | [1987/05] | English: | Hydraulically damped engine mount having two chambers | [1987/05] | French: | Support de moteur à amortissement hydraulique et à deux chambres | [1987/05] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.1992
06.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Fichtel & Sachs AG Bogestrasse 50 D-53783 Eitorf / DE | [1993/31] |
Former [1992/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.1992
BOGE AG Bogestrassse 50 D-53783 Eitorf / DE | 11.11.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.03.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.04.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 10.06.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.12.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.01.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.01.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP60132145 [ ]; | [A]US4159091 (LE SALVER ROBERT [FR], et al); | [X]EP0040290 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]); | [A]EP0072262 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]GB2137727 (DUNLOP LTD); | [X]FR2547378 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]); | [XP]EP0154828 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 294 (M-431)[2017], 20. November 1985; & JP-A-60 132 145 (BRIDGESTONE K.K.) 15-07-1985 (Kat. X), & JP60132145 A 00000000 |