EP0210575 - Electrical radiant heating element for heating hot plates, and process and device for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1992 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.G.O. Elektro-Geräte Blanc u. Fischer Rote-Tor-Strasse Postfach 11 80 D-75032 Oberderdingen / DE | [1987/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikschl, Bernhard Blumenstrasse 1 D-7519 Sulzfeld / DE | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110033.7 | 22.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | DE19853527413 | 31.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3527413 | [1987/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210575 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210575 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74, H05B3/68 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
H05B3/688 (EP,US);
H05B3/748 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Strahlheizkörper zur Beheizung von Heizflächen sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu seiner Herstellung | [1992/07] | English: | Electrical radiant heating element for heating hot plates, and process and device for its manufacture | [1987/06] | French: | Corps de chauffe électrique à radiation pour réchauffer des plaques chauffantes ainsi que procédé et dispositif pour sa fabrication | [1987/06] |
Former [1987/06] | Elektrischer Strahlheizkörper zur Beheizung von Heizflächen sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur seiner Herstellung | Examination procedure | 09.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/24] | 28.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 21.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.1992 | SE | 23.07.1992 | CH | 31.07.1992 | LI | 31.07.1992 | [1994/25] |
Former [1993/23] | SE | 23.07.1992 | |
CH | 31.07.1992 | ||
LI | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | SE | 23.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE464026 ; | [A]US2235091 (VINEBERG SAMUEL S); | [A]FR880865 ; | [A]FR929589 ; | [A]EP0031514 (EGO ELEKTRO BLANC & FISCHER [DE]); | [A]EP0071048 (EGO ELEKTRO BLANC & FISCHER [DE]); | [A]EP0105968 (ELPAG AG CHUR [CH]) |