EP0212308 - Arthroscopic instrument with suction tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hensler, Ewald Hegaustrasse 3 D-7717 Hattingen / DE | [1987/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Heusler, Wolfgang, et al V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110132.7 | 23.07.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | DE19853526822 | 26.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3526822 | [1987/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0212308 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212308 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61M1/00 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/1608 (EP);
A61B17/2833 (EP);
A61B2017/292 (EP);
A61B2217/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | Arthroskopie-Instrument mit Absaugrohr | [1987/10] | English: | Arthroscopic instrument with suction tube | [1987/10] | French: | Instrument d'arthroscopie avec tube de succion | [1987/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 08.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.07.1990 | FR | 04.07.1990 | GB | 04.07.1990 | IT | 04.07.1990 | NL | 04.07.1990 | SE | 04.07.1990 | AT | 23.07.1990 | CH | 31.07.1990 | LI | 31.07.1990 | LU | 31.07.1990 | DE | 03.04.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 04.07.1990 | |
GB | 04.07.1990 | ||
IT | 04.07.1990 | ||
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
AT | 23.07.1990 | ||
CH | 31.07.1990 | ||
LI | 31.07.1990 | ||
LU | 31.07.1990 | ||
FR | 23.11.1990 | ||
DE | 03.04.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 04.07.1990 | |
GB | 04.07.1990 | ||
IT | 04.07.1990 | ||
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
AT | 23.07.1990 | ||
CH | 31.07.1990 | ||
LI | 31.07.1990 | ||
FR | 23.11.1990 | ||
DE | 03.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | BE | 04.07.1990 | |
GB | 04.07.1990 | ||
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
AT | 23.07.1990 | ||
CH | 31.07.1990 | ||
LI | 31.07.1990 | ||
FR | 23.11.1990 | ||
DE | 03.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/51] | BE | 04.07.1990 | |
GB | 04.07.1990 | ||
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
CH | 31.07.1990 | ||
LI | 31.07.1990 | ||
FR | 23.11.1990 | ||
DE | 03.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/42] | BE | 04.07.1990 | |
GB | 04.07.1990 | ||
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
CH | 31.07.1990 | ||
LI | 31.07.1990 | ||
FR | 23.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/40] | BE | 04.07.1990 | |
GB | 04.07.1990 | ||
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
FR | 23.11.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | BE | 04.07.1990 | |
GB | 04.07.1990 | ||
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | GB | 04.07.1990 | |
NL | 04.07.1990 | ||
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/30] | GB | 04.07.1990 | |
SE | 04.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 04.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | DE932741 [ ] (RICHARD WOLF); | US2751908 [ ] (WALLACE FREDERICK J); | DE1091700 [ ] (GUSTAV MUELLER K G); | GB1215439 [ ] (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]); | EP0119405 [ ] (DYONICS INC [US]) |