EP0248106 - Injection nozzle for making moulded parts from three different plastic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battenfeld GmbH Scherl 10 D-58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | [1988/22] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states Battenfeld Maschinenfabriken GmbH Scherl 10 Postfach 1164/1165 D-5882 Meinerzhagen 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckardt, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Goethestrasse 18 D-5882 Meinerzhagen 1 / DE | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerd, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | [1987/50] | Application number, filing date | 86110280.4 | 25.07.1986 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | DE19863618616 | 03.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3618616 | [1987/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248106 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248106 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
B29C45/1604 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1987/50] | Title | German: | Spritzdüse zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus drei verschiedenen Kunststoffkomponenten | [1987/50] | English: | Injection nozzle for making moulded parts from three different plastic components | [1987/50] | French: | Buse d'injection pour la fabrication de pièces moulées à partir de trois composants de matière plastique différents | [1987/50] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/50] | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.07.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2217146 ; | [A]US4052497 ; | [A]GB939911 |