EP0211369 - Ic card system employing remote pin entry card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER COMPANY LIMITED 6-1, 2-chome, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER COMPANY LIMITED 6-1, 2-chome, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rikuna, Kenji Pat.Dept. Dev.Div. Hamura R&D Center Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 3-2-1, Sakae-cho Hamura-machi Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Strasse, Joachim Strasse & Hofstetter Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110370.3 | 28.07.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | JP19850167495 | 31.07.1985 Original published format: JP 16749585 | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0211369 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0211369 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211369 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/229 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/09] | Title | German: | Chipkartensystem das eine Karte zur entfernten Eingabe der persönlichen Identifizierungsnummer verwendet | [1987/09] | English: | Ic card system employing remote pin entry card | [1987/09] | French: | Système à carte à circuit intégré utilisant une carte d'entrée à distance du numéro d'identification personnel | [1987/09] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4277837 (STUCKERT PAUL E); | [A]EP0049650 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [XP]GB2151987 (HICKIE CHRISTOPHER JOHN); | [A]FR2526977 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]FR2536928 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SECURE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 22nd-23rd February 1984, pages 1-4, The Institution of Electrical Engineers, London, GB; D.W. DAVIES: "Smart cards, digital signatures and negotiable documents" |