EP0213392 - Apparatus for mounting dry neutron thimble detectors and for cleaning their guide tubes in boiling water reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states KRAFTWERK UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wiesenstrasse 35 D-4330 Mülheim (Ruhr) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zahn, Artur Goethestrasse 6 D-8751 Bessenbach / DE | 02 /
Hannappel, Karl Wiesthaler Strasse 6 D-8771 Wiesthal / DE | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1987/39] |
Former [1987/11] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110399.2 | 28.07.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | DE19853528723 | 09.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3528723 | [1987/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213392 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213392 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/10 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
G21C17/108 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Montage von trockenen LVD-Lanzen und zum Spülen von Lanzengehäuserohren in Siedewasserreaktoren | [1987/11] | English: | Apparatus for mounting dry neutron thimble detectors and for cleaning their guide tubes in boiling water reactors | [1987/11] | French: | Appareil de montage de détecteurs de flux neutronique à sec et de rincage de leurs tubes de guidage dans les réacteurs à eau bouillante | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 22.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2817830 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG); | [A]DE2832122 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG) | [A] - NUCLEAR ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL, Band 29, Nr. 356, Juni 1984, Seiten 35,36, Sutton, Surrey, GB; "Cleaning the thimble guide-tubes at Bugey" |