EP0214438 - Cylinder for carding machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1994 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schubert & Salzer Maschinenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states Schubert & Salzer Maschinenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 D-85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landwehrkamp, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Lilienstrasse 4 D-8071 Lenting / DE | [1987/12] | Application number, filing date | 86110471.9 | 29.07.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | DE19853531850 | 06.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3531850 | [1987/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0214438 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0214438 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/16 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
D01G15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/12] | Title | German: | Trommel für Kardiermaschinen | [1987/12] | English: | Cylinder for carding machines | [1987/12] | French: | Tambour pour les machines de cardage | [1987/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 22.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/45] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB692898 (HUBERT DUESBERG); | [X]DE191182 ; | [A]GB739311 (STEWART & SONS WM R); | [A]GB893426 (KARL MARX STADT MASCHF); | [A]FR1347814 (DCM); | [A]US2523751 (WELTER AMTHOR S) |