EP0255552 - Method and device for contactless measuring of changes of length on structural members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/06] | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gernhart, Peter Bergstrasse 1 D-9763 Klingenberg / DE | 02 /
Hintz, Gerhard Holzgasse 44 D-6101 Rossdorf 1 / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Peter Taunustrasse 83 D-6101 Rossdorf 1 / DE | 04 /
Keller, Günter Am Felsenkeller 47 D-6101 Modautal 1 / DE | [1988/06] | Representative(s) | Brandt, Ernst-Ulrich Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Brandt, Ernst-Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1988/06] | Brand, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung Landwehrstrasse 55 Postfach 4018 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110887.6 | 06.08.1986 | [1988/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255552 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255552 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/16, G01B11/02 | [1988/06] | CPC: |
G01B11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/14] |
Former [1988/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur berührungslosen Messung von Längenänderungen an Bauteilen | [1988/06] | English: | Method and device for contactless measuring of changes of length on structural members | [1988/06] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la mesure sans contact de changements de longueur de pièces détachées | [1988/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.08.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, IT, LU, NL, SE | 16.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 06.08.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.08.1990 | LI | 31.08.1990 | [1991/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0023643 ; | [AD]DE3334976 ; | [A]GB2147759 ; | [A]DE3422988 |