EP0215277 - Rotating viscometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTRAVES AG Schaffhauserstrasse 580 8052 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states CONTRAVES AG Schaffhauserstrasse 580 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zemp, Georg Friedheimstrasse 26 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | [1987/13] | Application number, filing date | 86110957.7 | 08.08.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | CH19850003475 | 13.08.1985 Original published format: CH 347585 | [1987/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215277 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215277 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/14 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
G01N11/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | Rotationsviskosimeter | [1987/13] | English: | Rotating viscometer | [1987/13] | French: | Viscomètre rotatif | [1987/13] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4045999 ; | [Y]FR2160093 ; | [A]US3470732 ; | [A]FR1448141 |