EP0212487 - Method and device for controlling vertical scan speed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Koozoo 3107-7 Mayumi-cho Hitachi-oota-shi Ibaraki 313 / JP | 02 /
Hamada, Nagaharu 10-12, Nishi-narusawa-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 03 /
Tadauchi, Masaharu 3-6, Sannomaru 2-chome Mito-shi Ibaraki 310 / JP | 04 /
Kozima, Yasuyuki 7-15-1 Kanesawa-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 05 /
Sakata, Kunihiro 520-45 Shimo-yamaguchi Hayama-machi Miura-gun Kanagawa 240-01 / JP | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/10] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86110965.0 | 08.08.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | JP19850177543 | 14.08.1985 Original published format: JP 17754385 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0212487 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0212487 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212487 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/17 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der vertikalen Abtastgeschwindigkeit | [1987/10] | English: | Method and device for controlling vertical scan speed | [1987/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour commander la vitesse verticale de balayage | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/07] | 05.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]DE3447466 (RICOH KK [JP]); | [AP]DE3512070 (CANON KK [JP]); | [AP]US4543613 (SAKAMOTO TAKASHI [JP]); | [AP]EP0163898 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4215374 (MIZUNO SHOJI [JP]) |