EP0211445 - A magnetoresistive read transducer assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Shiezen 6946 Randol Creek Drive San Jose, Cal. 95120 / US | 02 /
Voegeli, Otto 13465 Sycamore Avenue Morgan Hill, Cal. 95037 / US | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 86110983.3 | 08.08.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | US19850765999 | 15.08.1985 Original published format: US 765999 | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211445 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211445 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/39 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
G11B5/3903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/09] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung eines magnetoresistiven Lesewandlers | [1987/09] | English: | A magnetoresistive read transducer assembly | [1987/09] | French: | Assemblage de transducteur de lecture magnétorésistif | [1987/09] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 15.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0124293 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [X]DE3118850 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]DE3339037 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]DE3311242 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]AT351795B (SONY CORP [JP]) |