EP0212638 - Self-tapping sleeve with an inside thread for plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Böllhoff & Co, GmbH & Co KG Archimedesstrasse 1-4 D-33649 Bielefeld / DE | [1987/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobusch, Klaus Torfstichweg 8 D-4800 Bielefeld 1 / DE | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/10] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86111573.1 | 21.08.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | DE19853530083 | 22.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3530083 | [1987/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0212638 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0212638 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/10 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
F16B25/0047 (EP);
F16B25/0015 (EP);
F16B37/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | Selbstschneidende Gewindebuchse für Kunststoffe | [1987/10] | English: | Self-tapping sleeve with an inside thread for plastics | [1987/10] | French: | Douille à filet intérieur autotaraudeuse pour matières plastiques | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 08.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 29.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2754870 [ ]; | EP0024528 [ ] (BURDSALL & WARD CO [US]); | EP0088366 [ ] (BERGNER RICHARD GMBH CO [DE]); | EP0104552 [ ] (JAEGER EBERHARD GMBH [DE]); | EP0109528 [ ] (EIBES KERB KONUS GMBH [DE]) |