EP0257123 - Active flexible wing aircraft control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2230 East Imperial Highway El Segundo California 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2230 East Imperial Highway El Segundo California 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tulinius, Jan 6111 Wintergreen Drive Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/09] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86111669.7 | 22.08.1986 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257123 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257123 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/38, B64C13/00 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
B64C3/38 (EP);
B64C13/00 (EP);
Y02T50/10 (EP);
Y02T50/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Aktives Steuersystem eines Flugzeuges mit biegsamem Flügel | [1988/09] | English: | Active flexible wing aircraft control system | [1988/09] | French: | Système de commande actif d'avion à aile flexible | [1988/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 21.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.1991
16.10.1991
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft Patente Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse, Tor 1 D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [1993/01] |
Former [1991/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.1991
Messerschmitt - Bölkow - Blohm GmbH, Ottobrunn Patente Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse, Tor 1 D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 04.11.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.05.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 03.08.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.09.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.09.1992 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/18] | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191216890 (RUMPLER LUFTFAHRZEUGBAU G M B [DE]); | [AD]US4562546 (WYKES JOHN H [US], et al); | [AD]US4330100 (ELBER WOLF) |