EP0213586 - Total flow turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishioka, Ryozo c/o Fuji Electric Co. Ltd. No. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS, et al Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS, et al Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86111746.3 | 25.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | JP19850190368 | 29.08.1985 Original published format: JP 19036885 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213586 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213586 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/04, F01D1/04, F01D11/04 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
F01D11/04 (EP,US);
F01D1/02 (EP,US);
F01D5/142 (EP,US);
F01K21/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Heisswasserdampfturbine | [1987/11] | English: | Total flow turbine | [1987/11] | French: | Turbine à eau chaude et vapeur | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR398600 (ARNOLD KIENAST [DE]); | [Y]US4463567 (AMEND WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US1390733 (PAUL SPIESS); | [A]DE844013 (ROEDER KARL DR-ING); | [A]CH242222 (ESCHER WYSS MASCHF AG [CH]); | [A]US3642292 (DOUGHERTY DENIS E); | [A]US3935710 (DICKINSON JOHN D); | [A]US4514137 (ELLIOTT DAVID G [US]); | [A]US3995428 (ROBERTS EDWARD S); | [A]EP0015742 (TRANSAMERICA DELAVAL INC [US]) |