EP0214550 - Process for the preparation of aspartame and agent for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1991 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Reinhold, Dr. Wiesenweg 5 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Schlingmann, Merten, Dr. Schneidhainer Strasse 32a D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Platen, Martin, Dr. Krautgartenweg 6 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | [1987/12] | Application number, filing date | 86111843.8 | 27.08.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | DE19853532027 | 09.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3532027 | [1987/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0214550 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0214550 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214550 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, C07K1/00, C12P21/02 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
C07K5/0613 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aspartam und Mittel zu seiner Durchführung | [1987/12] | English: | Process for the preparation of aspartame and agent for its preparation | [1987/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'aspartame et agent pour son élaboration | [1987/12] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0170148 (FARCHEMIA SPA [IT]); | [XP]EP0169937 (FARCHEMIA SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP0149594 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]EP0143881 (GEMA SA [ES]); | [X]EP0102483 (SIRAC SRL [IT]); | [Y]EP0099585 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0035047 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [X]EP0075160 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]GB1339101 (SEARLE & CO); | [X]GB2160870 (ERBA FARMITALIA); | [YD]DE2801238 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD, et al) | [Y] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, Nr. 28, 1979, Seiten 2611-2612, Pergamon Press Ltd, GB; Y. ISOWA et al.: "The thermolysin-catalyzed condensation reaction of N-substituted aspartic and glutamic acids with phenylalanine alkyl esters" | [Y] - HOUBEN-WEYL: "Methoden der organischen Chemie", Band E5, Carbonsäuren und Carbonsäure-Derivate, 1985, Seiten 702-705, Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart, DE; H. PIELARTZIK et al.: "Aus Carbonsäure-estern" | Examination | US3941831 | JPS5484522 |