EP0218081 - Sliding gate valves and methods of operating them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.1994 [1994/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USX ENGINEERS AND CONSULTANTS, INC. 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states USX ENGINEERS AND CONSULTANTS, INC. 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | ||
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states USS ENGINEERS AND CONSULTANTS, INC. 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Patrick Dana 1808 Lon Drive Rantoul, IL 61866 / US | [1993/02] |
Former [1987/16] | 01 /
King, Patrick Dana 1808 Lon Drive Rantoul Illinois 61866 / US | Representative(s) | Simpson, Ronald Duncan Innes, et al A.A.Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WCIV 7LE / GB | [1987/16] | Application number, filing date | 86111932.9 | 26.03.1984 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | US19830478218 | 24.03.1983 Original published format: US 478218 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218081 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218081 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/08, F27D3/15 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
F27D3/1509 (EP,US);
B22D41/08 (KR);
B22D41/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/16] | B22D41/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/16] | Title | German: | Flachschieber und Verfahren zur Betätigung | [1987/16] | English: | Sliding gate valves and methods of operating them | [1987/16] | French: | Tiroir glissant et méthode d'actionnement | [1987/16] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 11.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84302006.6 / EP0120695 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.08.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT308989B (USS ENG & CONSULT [US]); | [A]US3831825 (KUTZER H, et al); | [A]GB1466346 (USS ENG & CONSULT); | [A]GB1492533 (FLOGATES LTD); | [AD]US4063668 (SHAPLAND EARL P, et al); | [A]GB1495400 (USS ENG & CONSULT); | [A]AT340616B (USS ENG & CONSULT [US]); | [AD]US4269399 (TINNES BERNHARD, et al); | [AD]US4273315 (TINNES BERNHARD) | Examination | US4000837 | US4003561 | GB2075647 |