EP0216200 - Cutoff valve, particularly for the cutoff of high-temperature fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Narduzzi, Franco Viale Cairoli 18 I-29017 Fiorenzuola D'Arda Piacenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states Narduzzi, Franco Viale Cairoli 18 I-29017 Fiorenzuola D'Arda Piacenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86112045.9 | 01.09.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | IT19850022106 | 10.09.1985 Original published format: IT 2210685 | [1987/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216200 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216200 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0216200 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/20, F16K5/06 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
F16K5/204 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/14] | F16K5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/14] | Title | German: | Absperrventil, insbesondere für heisse Flüssigkeiten | [1987/14] | English: | Cutoff valve, particularly for the cutoff of high-temperature fluids | [1987/14] | French: | Obturateur, en particulier pour des fluides de haute température | [1987/14] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 13.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2765142 (LUDEMAN OSCAR H); | [A]FR1563075 | Examination | EP0145632 |