EP0215404 - Body guide on a machine for the butt-welding of can bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states ELPATRONIC AG Baarerstrasse 112 CH-6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weil, Wolfgang Hattsteinstrasse 3 D-7843 Heitersheim / DE | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Hotz, Klaus c/o SOUDRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 Postfach 11 8962 Bergdietikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing. / ETH c/o SOUDRONIC AG Industriestrasse 35 Postfach 11 CH-8962 Bergdietikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 86112355.2 | 06.09.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | CH19850003883 | 09.09.1985 Original published format: CH 388385 | [1987/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215404 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
B23K37/053 (EP);
B21D51/2676 (EP);
B23K26/244 (EP);
B23K26/262 (EP);
B23K2101/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/13] | Title | German: | Zargenführung an einer Maschine zum Stumpfschweissen von Dosenzargen | [1987/13] | English: | Body guide on a machine for the butt-welding of can bodies | [1987/13] | French: | Guidage de pièces brutes sur une machine pour souder bout à bout des pièces brutes de boîtes | [1987/13] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE969360 [ ]; | US4207453 [ ]; | US4354090 [ ] |