EP0238709 - Heat-sensitive recording materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP CO. LTD. 4-5 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states SANYO KOKUSAKU PULP CO. LTD. 4-5 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasamatsu, Norikazu Sanyo Pulp Apart., No. 18-3-302 Hosoyama 4-chome Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsukawa, Masao No. 6-8, Wakabayashi 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hirata, Hirokazu No. 5-86-6, Kasumigaoka 3-chome Kamifukuoka-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86112507.8 | 10.09.1986 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | JP19860063974 | 24.03.1986 Original published format: JP 6397486 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238709 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238709 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238709 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
B41M5/3372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/40] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliche Aufzeichnungsmaterialien | [1987/40] | English: | Heat-sensitive recording materials | [1987/40] | French: | Matériels pour l'enregistrement sensible à la chaleur | [1987/40] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59169887 ; | [A]JP58193187 ; | [A]JP58145492 ; | [A]JP57189892 ; | [A]JP5793198 ; | [XP]GB2166558 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]EP0159659 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 25 (M-355)[1748], 2nd February 1985; & JP-A-59 169 887 (RICOH K.K.) 25-09-1984, & JP59169887 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 37 (M-277)[1474], 17th February 1984; & JP-A-58 193 187 (RICOH K.K.) 10-11-1983, & JP58193187 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 265 (M-258)[1410], 25th November 1983; & JP-A-58 145 492 (RICOH K.K.) 30-08-1983, & JP58145492 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 37 (M-193)[1182], 15th February 1983; & JP-A-57 189 892 (RICOH K.K.) 22-11-1982, & JP57189892 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 187 (M-158)[1065], 25th September 1982; & JP-A-57 93 198 (RICOH K.K.) 10-06-1982, & JP5793198 A 00000000 |