EP0226718 - Parenteral fluid administration set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BECTON, DICKINSON & COMPANY One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states BECTON, DICKINSON & COMPANY One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alchas, Paul G. 320 Claremont Avenue, 16A Montclair New Jersey / US | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/27] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86112606.8 | 11.09.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | US19850809093 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: US 809093 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226718 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226718 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226718 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
A61M5/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/16] | A61M5/16, A61J1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1987/27] | A61M5/14 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | System zur parenteralen Verabreichung von Flüssigkeiten | [1987/27] | English: | Parenteral fluid administration set | [1987/27] | French: | Ensemble d'administration parentérale de fluide | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 13.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2416391 (HIXSON CHARLES R); | [AD]US2668533 (EVANS ROBERT P); | [AD]US2884924 (SHAW JOHN E B); | [AD]US3402713 (SENKOWSKI THADDEUS S, et al); | [A]EP0012445 (BERNARD INGRID [DE]); | [A]GB1579065 (HAUSTRUP PLASTIC AS) |