EP0221319 - Contact pin for technics of solderless connections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leonhardy GmbH Hersbruckerstrasse 23 D-8561 Reichenschwand / DE | [1987/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rolf, Helmut Jahnstrasse 42 D-8501 Feucht / DE | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 Postfach 11 65 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Vogel, Georg Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 Postfach 11 65 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113112.6 | 24.09.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | DE19853537164 | 18.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3537164 | [1987/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221319 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221319 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/09 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
H01R12/585 (EP);
H01R12/58 (US);
H05K3/308 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | Anschlussstift für lötfreie Anschlusstechniken | [1987/20] | English: | Contact pin for technics of solderless connections | [1987/20] | French: | Broche pour les techniques de connexions sans soudure | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1540251 (OXLEY ROBERT FREDERICK); | [A]FR2239840 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]DE2741583 (DU PONT); | [AD]DE2937883 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE3233652 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0105044 (BURNDY ELECTRA NV [BE]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 25, Nr. 6, November 1982, Seiten 3138-3139; F.G. ALLEN et al.: "Card connector" |