EP0216390 - Low consistency, one-part silicone elastomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION P.O. Box 1767 Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION P.O. Box 1767 Midland Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homan, Gary Rex 2801 Dawn Drive Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
Lee, Chi-Long 1813 Brookfield Midland Michigan / US | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Spott, Gottfried, et al Spott & Weinmiller Patentanwälte Fasanenstrasse 159 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | Spott, Gottfried, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Spott, Weinmiller & Partner Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113268.6 | 26.09.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | US19850780747 | 27.09.1985 Original published format: US 780747 | [1987/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216390 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216390 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08K5/00, C08K13/02, C08K13/00 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
C08K9/10 (EP,US);
C08K13/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
C08K5/5425 (EP,US);
C08K5/5455 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K13/02, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/14, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/5425, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/5455, C08L83/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/5477, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/549, C08L83/04 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/14] | Title | German: | Einkomponenten-Silikonelastomere mit niedriger Konsistenz | [1987/14] | English: | Low consistency, one-part silicone elastomers | [1987/14] | French: | Elastomères de silicone en une seule composante à faible consistance | [1987/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 19.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 28.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4347336 (HOMAN GARY R, et al); | [AD]US4020044 (CROSSAN IRVIN D, et al); | [AD]US3766127 (TOPORCER L, et al) |