EP0217326 - Semiconductor device with a high breakdown voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baba, Yoshiro Pat. Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1- Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Tsuru, Kazuo Pat. Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1- Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Akiyama, Tatsuo Pat. Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1- Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Koshino, Yutaka Pat. Division K.K. Toshiba 1-1- Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Klaus, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hoffmann, Klaus, Dr. rer. nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/15] | Hoffmann, Klaus, Dr. rer. nat. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113342.9 | 29.09.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | JP19850216586 | 30.09.1985 Original published format: JP 21658685 | [1987/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217326 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217326 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217326 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/06 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
H01L29/405 (EP,US);
H01L29/04 (EP,US);
H01L29/0619 (EP,US);
H01L29/408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/15] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung mit einer hohen Durchbruchspannung | [1987/15] | English: | Semiconductor device with a high breakdown voltage | [1987/15] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur à haute tension de claquage | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/15] | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3971061 (MATSUSHITA TAKESHI, et al); | [A]GB2047461 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED) | [X] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 15, no. 7, 1976, supplement, pages 41-48, Tokyo, JP; H. MOCHIZUKI et al.: "Semi-insulating polycrystalline-silicon (SIPOS) films applied to MOS integrated circuits" | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, vol. ED-23, no. 8, August 1976, pages 826-830, IEEE, New York, US; T. MATSUSHITA et al.: "Highly reliable high-voltage transistors by use of the SIPOS process" | Examination | US4014037 |