EP0265530 - Process for soldering aluminium parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verwaltungsgesellschaft Heinrich Neitz GmbH & Co. KG Bielefelder Strasse 326 D-4930 Detmold 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states Verwaltungsgesellschaft Heinrich Neitz GmbH & Co. KG Bielefelder Strasse 326 D-4930 Detmold 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neitz, Günter Körner Strasse 10 D-4930 Detmold / DE | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Hanewinkel, Lorenz Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Hanewinkel, Lorenz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113361.9 | 29.09.1986 | [1988/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0265530 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/19 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
B23K1/19 (EP);
B23K2101/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Löten von Aluminiumteilen | [1988/18] | English: | Process for soldering aluminium parts | [1988/18] | French: | Procédé de soudage de pièces en aluminium | [1988/18] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 18.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2185946 ; | [A]FR2419131 ; | [A]DE2018615 ; | [A]FR2291821 |