EP0217369 - Power transmission arrangement for telecommunications systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1987/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gavrilovich, Charles Dan 7S533 Plainfield Road Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113473.2 | 01.10.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | US19850783129 | 02.10.1985 Original published format: US 783129 | [1987/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217369 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217369 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217369 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04M19/00, H04M19/06, H04M19/08 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
H04M19/00 (EP,US);
H04M19/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/15] | H04M19/00, H04M19/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1989/46] |
Former [1987/15] | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Speisungsübertragungsanordnung für Fernmeldesysteme | [1987/15] | English: | Power transmission arrangement for telecommunications systems | [1987/15] | French: | Dispositif de transmission de l'alimentation pour systèmes de télécommunications | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR | 12.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 09.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.1986 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 03.11.1986 | GR   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.02.1994 | CH | 16.02.1994 | LI | 16.02.1994 | NL | 16.02.1994 | SE | 16.02.1994 | [1995/10] |
Former [1994/49] | BE | 16.02.1994 | |
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | CH | 16.02.1994 | |
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 16.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3344008 (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH); | [A]US3036220 (ERIC LATIMER KENNETH); | [A]GB2152331 (NITSUKO LTD); | [A]DE2901357 (SIEMENS AG) | [Y] - CABLES & TRANSMISSION, vol. 33, no. 1, January 1979, pages 48-82, Paris, FR; Y.-M. LE GRAND: "Téléalimentation des équipements de ligne en courant alternatif et en courant continu" | [A] - REVIEW OF THE ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION LABORATORIES, vol. 32, no. 1, part 2, 1984, pages 139-146, Tokyo, JP; S. MANO et al.: "INS model system user/network interface" |