EP0223976 - Ski stiffened in torsion by a bellows [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1992 [1992/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Girard, Donald A. P. O. Box 172 Rancho Cordova, California 95670 / US | [1987/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/23] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113568.9 | 02.10.1986 | [1987/23] | Priority number, date | US19850800501 | 21.11.1985 Original published format: US 800501 | [1987/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0223976 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0223976 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223976 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/07 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
A63C5/07 (EP,US);
A63C5/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR [1987/23] | Title | German: | Durch eine Ringbalgfeder torsionsgesicherter Ski | [1987/23] | English: | Ski stiffened in torsion by a bellows | [1987/23] | French: | Ski rigidifié en torsion par un soufflet | [1987/23] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/37] | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH200702 (SERR WILLIAM [US]); | [A]DE1603002 (WITTKE RUDOLF) |