EP0220530 - Improved thermoplastic grid melter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 555 Jackson Street P. O. Box 151 Amherst Ohio 44001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 555 Jackson Street P. O. Box 151 Amherst Ohio 44001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boccagno, George E. 787 Brownlee Lane Lawrenceville Georgia 30245 / US | 02 /
Scholl, Charles H. 3699 Hermitage Drive Duluth Georgia 30136 / US | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113615.8 | 02.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | US19850792673 | 29.10.1985 Original published format: US 792673 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0220530 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0220530 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220530 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29B13/02 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
B29B13/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1987/19] | Title | German: | Schmelzrost für thermoplastische Werkstoffe | [1987/19] | English: | Improved thermoplastic grid melter | [1987/19] | French: | Dispositif à grille pour la fusion de matériaux thermoplastiques | [1987/19] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/32: Teilanmeldung 89118901.1 eingereicht am 02/10/86 | EPB 1990/32: Divisional application 89118901.1 filed on 02/10/86 | EPB 1990/32: Demande divisionnaire 89118901.1 déposée le 02/10/86 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 25.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89118901.1 / EP0353792 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3964645 [ ] (SCHOLL CHARLES H); | FR987112 [ ] |