EP0218210 - Cleanroom structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daw, Incorporated 4080 South West Temple Salt Lake City Utah 84107 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states Daw, Incorporated 4080 South West Temple Salt Lake City Utah 84107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daw, Terry L. 4080 South West Temple Salt Lake City Utah 84107 / US | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/16] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113679.4 | 03.10.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | US19850783789 | 03.10.1985 Original published format: US 783789 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218210 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/16, E04B1/08, E04H5/02, F16B5/06 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
B01L1/04 (EP,US);
E04B1/08 (EP,US);
E04H5/02 (EP,US);
F16B5/0642 (EP,US);
F16B5/065 (EP,US);
F16B5/0664 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/16] | Title | German: | Reinraumstruktur | [1987/16] | English: | Cleanroom structure | [1987/16] | French: | Structure de salle blanche | [1987/16] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 06.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/50] | 06.07.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0067577 (ROBERTS GRAHAM STEED [GB], et al); | [X]US4409889 (BURLESON MAURICE L [US]); | [XP]EP0180139 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0196333 (TAKASAGO THERMAL ENGINEERING [JP]); | [A]US3158457 (WHITFIELD WILLIS J); | [A]FR2358854 (OZTEKIN MUAMMER AHMET [US]) |