EP0223035 - Use of modified Raney catalysts in the production of aromatic diamino compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becher, Dieter, Dr. Moltkestrasse 8 D-4047 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
Birkenstock, Udo, Dr. Schneppersdelle 2 D-4030 Ratingen 8 / DE | 03 /
Waldau, Eckart, Dr. Benrather Schlossufer 7 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 04 /
Witt, Harro, Dr. Möhlenbag 2 D-2224 Kuden / DE | [1987/22] | Application number, filing date | 86113764.4 | 04.10.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | DE19853537247 | 19.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3537247 | [1987/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223035 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223035 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C85/11, C07C87/58, B01J25/00, B01J25/02 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
B01J25/02 (EP,US);
B01J25/00 (EP,US);
C07C209/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/22] | Title | German: | Verwendung von modifizierten Raney-Katalysatoren zur Herstellung von aromatischen Diaminoverbindungen | [1987/22] | English: | Use of modified Raney catalysts in the production of aromatic diamino compounds | [1987/22] | French: | Utilisation de catalyseurs Raney modifiés pour la fabrication de composés diaminoaromatiques | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/22] | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP55035064 ; | [X]EP0091027 (OLIN CORP [US]); | [X]DE2713374 (BAYER AG); | [A]GB919273 (GEN ANILINE & FILM CORP); | [A]FR1066582 (ELECTRO CHIMIE SOC D) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 69 (C-11)[551], 22. Mai 1980; & JP-A-55 035064 (KURARAY K.K.) 11.03.1980, & JP55035064 A 00000000 |