EP0219773 - Sun-protecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1990 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.1990 [1990/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED INDUSTRIES HOLDING S.A. 14, Rue Aldringen Luxemburg / LU | [1988/24] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states Haebler, Hayo Dipl.-Ing. Darmstädter Strasse 24 D-6140 Bensheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haebler, Hayo, Dipl.Ing. Darmstaedterstrasse 24 D6140 Bensheim / DE | [1988/23] |
Former [1987/18] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86113994.7 | 09.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | DE19853536390 | 11.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3536390 | [1987/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219773 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219773 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/08, E04F10/02 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
E04F10/0607 (EP);
E06B9/40 (EP);
E04F10/0662 (EP);
E04F10/067 (EP);
E04F10/0685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | Sonnenschutzvorrichtung | [1987/18] | English: | Sun-protecting device | [1987/18] | French: | Dispositif de protection solaire | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 19.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 08.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/43] | 29.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0119966 ; | [Y]CH451656 ; | [A]FR2144914 ; | [AP]DE8608403U ; | [AP]EP0167500 ; | [A]DE3314343 ; | [A]DE2805683 |