EP0223056 - Blends of aromatic polycarbonates and aromatic polyester carbonates and their use in the production of moulded articles, sheets, fibres, filaments and coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serini, Volker, Dr. Sebastian-Kneipp-Weg 2 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Freitag, Dieter, Dr. Hasenheide 10 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 03 /
Rathmann, Dietrich, Dr. Alte Landstrasse 119 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1987/22] | Application number, filing date | 86114127.3 | 13.10.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | DE19853537622 | 23.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3537622 | [1987/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223056 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223056 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, // (C08L69/00, 69:00) | [1987/22] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08L69/005 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/005, C08L69/00 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L69/005 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/22] | Title | German: | Mischungen aromatischer Polycarbonate und aromatischer Polyestercarbonate und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Formkörpern, Folien, Fasern, Filamenten und Beschichtungen | [1987/22] | English: | Blends of aromatic polycarbonates and aromatic polyester carbonates and their use in the production of moulded articles, sheets, fibres, filaments and coatings | [1987/22] | French: | Mélanges de polycarbonates aromatiques et de polyestercarbonates aromatiques et leur utilisation dans la fabrication d'objets moulés, de feuilles, de fibres, de filaments et de revêtements | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/22] | 05.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]EP0010602 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [YD]EP0036080 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]US4436879 (MILLER KENNETH F [US], et al) |