EP0263895 - Surface treatment composition for glass fibers, method of coating glass fibers with said composition, and method of preparing glass fiber reinforced polyepoxide products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Druschke, Frank, Dr. Kauzenhecke 3 D-7000 Stuttgart 70 / DE | [1988/16] | Representative(s) | Kreidler, Eva-Maria Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 86114395.6 | 17.10.1986 | [1988/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263895 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263895 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/02, C07F7/18 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
C03C25/40 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (EP);
H05K1/0366 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/16] | Title | German: | Oberflächenbehandlungszusammensetzung für Glasfasern, Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Glasfasern mit dieser Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von mit Glasfasern verstärkten Polyepoxid-Gegenständen | [1988/16] | English: | Surface treatment composition for glass fibers, method of coating glass fibers with said composition, and method of preparing glass fiber reinforced polyepoxide products | [1988/16] | French: | Composition de traitement de surface pour fibres de verre, méthode de revêtement de fibres de verre avec cette composition et méthode de préparation de produits en polyépoxyde renforcés de fibres de verre | [1988/16] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.03.1991 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3755354 |