EP0226749 - Pair of traction rollers in a rotary printing machine for advancing print carrier webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Johannes Bleriotstrasse 42 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1987/27] | Application number, filing date | 86114636.3 | 22.10.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | DE19853545295 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3545295 | [1987/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226749 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226749 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226749 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/02, B65H27/00 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
B65H45/221 (EP,US);
B65H20/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Zugwalzenpaar für eine Rotationsdruckmaschine zum Transportieren von Druckträgerbahnen | [1987/27] | English: | Pair of traction rollers in a rotary printing machine for advancing print carrier webs | [1987/27] | French: | Paire de rouleaux de traction dans une machine rotative d'impression pour le transport de bandes de support d'impression | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2357208 (FRANKENTHAL AG ALBERT); | [A]DE2362393 (HORSENS TEKNISK GUMMI AS) |