EP0231440 - Vehicle sun visor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Happich GmbH Postfach 10 02 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
SE
Daimler Benz Aktiengesellschaft FTP-C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states Gebr. Happich GmbH Postfach 10 02 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
SE
Daimler Benz Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgart-Untertürkheim Postfach 202 D-7000 Stuttgart 60 / DE | |||
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states Gebr. Happich GmbH Postfach 10 02 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stuck, Klaus, Dr. Thomas-Mann-Strasse 23 D-4095 Meerbusch 2 / DE | 02 /
Cziptschirsch, Kurt Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 25 D-5620 Velbert 15 / DE | 03 /
Juraschek, Peter Vaihinger Strasse 81 D-7140 Ludwigsburg 10 / DE | 04 /
Nowak, Manfred Steinberg 16 D-5650 Solingen 1 / DE | 05 /
Kaiser, Klaus Peter Sellscheid 42 D-5632 Wermelskirchen / DE | [1987/33] | Application number, filing date | 86115010.0 | 29.10.1986 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | DE19863603852 | 07.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3603852 | [1987/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0231440 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0231440 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231440 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/02 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
B60J3/0239 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | Sonnenblende für Fahrzeuge | [1987/33] | English: | Vehicle sun visor | [1987/33] | French: | Pare-soleil pour véhicules | [1987/33] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 20.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3324305 (ZIPPERLE WOLFGANG); | [YD]DE3402416 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0149073 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE], et al); | [A]DE1580850 (STANLEY WORKS GMBH) |